EP4395208 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAN, Zhiyuan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
DONG, Pengpeng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHU, Huiying Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 22872073.6 | 22.09.2022 | [2024/27] | WO2022CN120624 | Priority number, date | CN202111132039 | 26.09.2021 Original published format: CN202111132039 | [2024/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023046029 | Date: | 30.03.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4395208 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L1/00 (EP);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L69/22 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2024/27] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2024/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE | [2024/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2024 | Translation filed | 28.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |