EP4406743 - INKJET HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCREEN Holdings Co., Ltd. 1-1,Tenjinkita-machi Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2024/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUJI Takanori Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | 02 /
YASUDA Tomonori Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 602-8585 / JP | 03 /
MATSUO Shigeki Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 04 /
IWABUCHI Masaru Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2024/31] | Representative(s) | Kilian Kilian & Partner mbB Zielstattstraße 23a 81379 München / DE | [2024/31] | Application number, filing date | 22872535.4 | 21.07.2022 | [2024/31] | WO2022JP28394 | Priority number, date | JP20210156145 | 24.09.2021 Original published format: JP 2021156145 | [2024/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023047779 | Date: | 30.03.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4406743 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/01, B41J2/175 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
B41J2/01 (EP);
B41J2/14209 (EP);
B41J2/155 (EP);
B41J2/175 (EP);
B41J2002/14362 (EP);
B41J2002/14459 (EP);
B41J2002/14491 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLKOPF | [2024/31] | English: | INKJET HEAD | [2024/31] | French: | TÊTE À JET D'ENCRE | [2024/31] | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.2024 | Translation filed | 26.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2012121278 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JP2012161992 (RICOH CO LTD); | [A]WO2016104126 (KONICA MINOLTA INC [JP]); | [A]JP2017019293 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [A]WO2019044031 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]); | [A]JP2021020348 (RICOH CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2017081049 |