EP4331886 - THERMAL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND VEHICLE HAVING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BYD Company Limited No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Dongsheng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | 02 /
BAI, Yunhui Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Junyan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | 04 /
ZHAO, Shangzhong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | 05 /
TANG, Yifeng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/10] | DehnsGermany Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22874536.0 | 31.08.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022CN116347 | Priority number, date | CN202111161075 | 30.09.2021 Original published format: CN202111161075 | [2024/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023051145 | Date: | 06.04.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4331886 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/04, B60H1/06, B60H1/14, B60H1/00 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H01M10/663 (EP,CN,KR);
B60H1/32284 (EP,KR);
B60K11/04 (CN);
B60H1/00278 (EP,KR,US);
B60H1/00885 (EP,KR,US);
B60H1/06 (EP,CN);
B60H1/143 (EP,CN,KR);
B60H1/3227 (EP,CN,US);
B60H1/323 (EP,CN);
B60K11/02 (KR);
H01M10/613 (EP,CN,KR);
H01M10/615 (EP,CN,KR);
H01M10/625 (EP,CN,KR);
H01M10/66 (EP,CN);
B60H1/00921 (EP);
B60H2001/00307 (EP,US);
B60H2001/00928 (EP);
B60H2001/00935 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM UND FAHRZEUG DAMIT | [2024/10] | English: | THERMAL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND VEHICLE HAVING SAME | [2024/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION THERMIQUE ET VÉHICULE LE COMPRENANT | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2023 | Translation filed | 28.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |