Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
24.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
03.04.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.03.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.03.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.03.2024 | Change - representative | |
22.03.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.04.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.04.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor |