Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024236889 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2024 | A9 | US2024137881 | 25.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210155482 | 12.11.2021 | KR20210129120 | 29.09.2021 | WO2022KR09731 | 06.07.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230046173 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20210129120 | 29.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4391683 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210155482 | 12.11.2021 | KR20210129120 | 29.09.2021 | WO2022KR09731 | 06.07.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023054859 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210155482 | 12.11.2021 | KR20210129120 | 29.09.2021 |