EP4391683 - BANDWIDTH-BASED SYNCHRONIZATION SIGNAL CONFIGURATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOON, Suha Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
RYU, Hyunseok Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Youngbum Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
MYUNG, Seho Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 22876634.1 | 06.07.2022 | [2024/26] | WO2022KR09731 | Priority number, date | KR20210129120 | 29.09.2021 Original published format: KR 20210129120 | KR20210155482 | 12.11.2021 Original published format: KR 20210155482 | [2024/26] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023054859 | Date: | 06.04.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4391683 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L5/00, H04J11/00, H04W48/10 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
H04W56/0015 (EP,US);
H04J11/00 (EP);
H04L27/26025 (EP,US);
H04L5/00 (EP);
H04W48/10 (EP);
H04W72/04 (EP);
H04W76/28 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONFIGURATION EINES BANDBREITENBASIERTEN SYNCHRONISATIONSSIGNALS | [2024/26] | English: | BANDWIDTH-BASED SYNCHRONIZATION SIGNAL CONFIGURATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2024/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CONFIGURATION DE SIGNAL DE SYNCHRONISATION SUR LA BASE D'UNE BANDE PASSANTE | [2024/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2024 | Translation filed | 21.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2019032614 (LENOVO SINGAPORE PTE LTD [SG]); | [A]WO2020168450 (MEDIATEK SINGAPORE PTE LTD [SG], et al); | [A]US2021084604 (XU WEIJIE [CN]); | [A]US2021160036 (REDDY AKULA [US], et al); | [A]US2021250882 (LIN ZHIPENG [CN], et al) |