EP4379923 - BATTERY MODULE, BATTERY PACK, VEHICLE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BATTERY MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Chan Kyu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/23] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22876689.5 | 30.08.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022KR12984 | Priority number, date | KR20210128158 | 28.09.2021 Original published format: KR 20210128158 | [2024/23] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023054914 | Date: | 06.04.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4379923 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/211, H01M50/249, H01M50/242 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
H01M50/249 (EP,KR);
H01M50/211 (EP,KR);
H01M50/209 (EP);
H01M50/242 (EP,KR);
H01M50/244 (EP);
H01M50/271 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEMODUL, BATTERIEPACK, FAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BATTERIEMODULS | [2024/23] | English: | BATTERY MODULE, BATTERY PACK, VEHICLE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BATTERY MODULE | [2024/23] | French: | MODULE DE BATTERIE, BLOC-BATTERIE, VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MODULE DE BATTERIE | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.2024 | Translation filed | 29.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 29.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20150057363 (SK CONTINENTAL E MOTION KOREA CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20190063109 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [DY]KR20190138072 (SK INNOVATION CO LTD [KR]); | [A]CN111554837 (HEFEI GUOXUAN HIGH TECH POWER ENERGY CO LTD); | [A]CN112563635 (SHANGHAI LANJUN NEW ENERGY TECH CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2015111493 | KR20170030954 | KR20190127056 | KR20190138072 |