EP4415145 - ADHESIVE FILM, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ADHESIVE FILM, POWER STORAGE DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING POWER STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2024/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Miho Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Takahiro Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2024/33] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2024/33] | Application number, filing date | 22878600.0 | 06.10.2022 | [2024/33] | WO2022JP37520 | Priority number, date | JP20210165118 | 06.10.2021 Original published format: JP 2021165118 | [2024/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023058733 | Date: | 13.04.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4415145 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/342, B65D65/40, H01M10/04, H01M50/105, H01M50/121, H01M50/129, H01M50/184, H01M50/193, H01M50/197, H01M50/198, H01M50/375 | [2024/33] | CPC: |
B65D65/40 (EP,KR);
H01M50/197 (EP,KR);
H01M10/04 (EP,KR);
H01M50/105 (EP,KR);
H01M50/121 (EP,KR);
H01M50/129 (EP,KR);
H01M50/184 (EP,KR);
H01M50/193 (EP,KR);
H01M50/198 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAFTFOLIE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HAFTFOLIE, ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2024/33] | English: | ADHESIVE FILM, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ADHESIVE FILM, POWER STORAGE DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING POWER STORAGE DEVICE | [2024/33] | French: | FILM ADHÉSIF, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FILM ADHÉSIF, DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2024/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2024 | Translation filed | 02.05.2024 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2024 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003242952 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD); | [A]JP2014225378 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2017062872 (DENSO CORP); | [PX]WO2021201213 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP2002008616 | JP2015079638 |