Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
23.02.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] |
23.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] |
08.01.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.01.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.12.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.12.2023 | Change - representative | |
22.12.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.04.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.04.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor |