EP4229871 - IMPROVEMENT ON MPM LIST CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Ling Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
LI, Xiang Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 03 /
LIU, Shan Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/34] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22879380.8 | 16.09.2022 | [2023/34] | WO2022US76581 | Priority number, date | US202163253976P | 08.10.2021 Original published format: US 202163253976 P | US202217944999 | 14.09.2022 Original published format: US202217944999 | [2023/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023059977 | Date: | 13.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4229871 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.04.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/11, H04N19/157, H04N19/176, H04N19/196, H04N19/463 | [2024/05] | CPC: |
H04N19/11 (EP,KR);
H04N19/196 (EP,US);
H04N19/107 (US);
H04N19/157 (EP,KR);
H04N19/159 (US);
H04N19/176 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/34] | H04N19/44, H04N19/103, H04N19/157, H04N19/169, H04N19/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG DER KONSTRUKTION EINER MPM-LISTE | [2023/34] | English: | IMPROVEMENT ON MPM LIST CONSTRUCTION | [2023/34] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DE LA CONSTRUCTION D'UNE LISTE MPM | [2023/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2020043092 (MEDIATEK SINGAPORE PTE LTD [SG], et al); | International search | [A]US2020195935 (SEREGIN VADIM [US], et al); | [A]WO2020184821 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]WO2020228578 (MEDIATEK INC [CN]) |