EP4306057 - PORTABLE REMOTE ULTRASOUND SCANNING SYSTEM AND COMPLIANCE CONTROL METHOD FOR SAFE ULTRASOUND SCANNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hefei Hebin Intelligent Robots Co., Ltd. Room 401, Building C1, Intelligent Technology Park No. 3963, Susong Road Economic And Technological Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Dongliang hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Zhen hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Dai, Simin Reyda IP 157, Quai du Président Roosevelt Appt A073 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22880056.1 | 08.09.2022 | [2024/03] | WO2022CN117694 | Priority number, date | CN202111199054 | 14.10.2021 Original published format: CN202111199054 | [2024/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023061113 | Date: | 20.04.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4306057 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
A61B8/565 (EP);
A61B8/08 (CN);
A61B8/54 (EP,CN,US);
A61B8/4218 (EP,US);
A61B8/4254 (US);
A61B8/429 (US);
A61B8/4411 (EP,CN);
A61B8/4416 (US);
A61B8/4427 (US);
A61B8/461 (CN,US);
A61B8/463 (CN);
A61B8/56 (US);
A61B8/582 (EP,CN);
B25J13/025 (US);
B25J13/085 (US);
B25J3/04 (US);
B25J9/1666 (US);
G16H40/67 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARES REMOTE-ULTRASCHALLABTASTSYSTEM UND KONFORMITÄTSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR SICHERE ULTRASCHALLABTASTUNG | [2024/03] | English: | PORTABLE REMOTE ULTRASOUND SCANNING SYSTEM AND COMPLIANCE CONTROL METHOD FOR SAFE ULTRASOUND SCANNING | [2024/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BALAYAGE À ULTRASONS À DISTANCE PORTABLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CONFORMITÉ POUR BALAYAGE À ULTRASONS SÛR | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2023 | Translation filed | 09.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |