EP4257996 - PARALLEL BATTERY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF PREDICTING REMAINING CHARGE TIME THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | 08.09.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KO, Youngjun Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
JANG, Jihoon Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/41] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22883793.6 | 22.09.2022 | [2023/41] | WO2022KR14182 | Priority number, date | KR20210138650 | 18.10.2021 Original published format: KR 20210138650 | [2023/41] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023068569 | Date: | 27.04.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4257996 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/367, G01R31/3842, G01R31/36, G01R31/396 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
G01R31/396 (EP,KR);
G01R31/367 (KR);
H01M10/482 (EP,US);
B60L58/12 (EP);
B60L58/18 (EP);
B60L58/22 (EP);
G01R31/3648 (KR);
G01R31/3842 (KR);
H01M10/441 (US);
H01M10/48 (EP);
H02J7/0013 (EP);
H02J7/0047 (EP);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US);
B60L2240/545 (EP);
B60L2240/547 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PARALLELES BATTERIESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE DER VERBLEIBENDEN LADEZEIT DAVON | [2023/41] | English: | PARALLEL BATTERY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF PREDICTING REMAINING CHARGE TIME THEREOF | [2023/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BATTERIE PARALLÈLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION DU TEMPS DE CHARGE RESTANT DE CELUI-CI | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2023 | Translation filed | 07.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP3692617B ; | [A]JP5979235B ; | [A]KR20190083897 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]JP2020036393 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]KR20200025495 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) |