EP4328748 - DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, COMPUTER DEVICE, COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Xiaoyu Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Dewei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
HAN, Feng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
LI, Jiaxin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 22885453.5 | 13.09.2022 | [2024/09] | WO2022CN118483 | Priority number, date | CN202111242449 | 25.10.2021 Original published format: CN202111242449 | [2024/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023071566 | Date: | 04.05.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4328748 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.05.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/08, G06F9/48, G06F9/445 | [2024/40] | CPC: |
G06F7/08 (EP,US);
G06F16/901 (US);
G06F9/445 (EP);
G06F9/48 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2024/09] | G06F9/48, G06F9/445 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, COMPUTERVORRICHTUNG, COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2024/09] | English: | DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, COMPUTER DEVICE, COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2024/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR, ET PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2024/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2023 | Translation filed | 20.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010031003 (CHEN LIANG [CN], et al); | [A]US2016357580 (LYASHEVSKY ALEXANDER [US]); | [A]US2020074690 (FUKAGAI TAKUYA [JP], et al) |