Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024258558 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20220135649 | 20.10.2022 | KR20210143662 | 26.10.2021 | WO2022KR16248 | 24.10.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230059736 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20210143662 | 26.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024520549 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20220135649 | 20.10.2022 | KR20210143662 | 26.10.2021 | WO2022KR16248 | 24.10.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117529837 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20220135649 | 20.10.2022 | WO2022KR16248 | 24.10.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4340084 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20220135649 | 20.10.2022 | KR20210143662 | 26.10.2021 | WO2022KR16248 | 24.10.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023075328 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20220135649 | 20.10.2022 | KR20210143662 | 26.10.2021 |