EP4300704 - CYLINDRICAL BATTERY CELL HAVING SPIRAL WELDING PART, AND BATTERY MODULE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SON, Min Su Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Ji Woo Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/01] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22887538.1 | 25.10.2022 | [2024/01] | WO2022KR16306 | Priority number, date | KR20210142324 | 25.10.2021 Original published format: KR 20210142324 | [2024/01] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023075342 | Date: | 04.05.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4300704 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/566, H01M50/516, H01M50/167, H01M50/213, B23K26/0622, B23K26/359, B23K101/36, H01M50/169, H01M10/04 | [2024/45] | CPC: |
B23K26/0876 (EP);
H01M50/566 (EP,KR);
H01M50/169 (EP,US);
B23K26/0624 (EP,KR);
B23K26/359 (KR);
H01M10/0422 (EP);
H01M50/107 (EP);
H01M50/152 (EP,US);
H01M50/167 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/213 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/50 (EP);
H01M50/502 (EP,US);
H01M50/512 (EP);
H01M50/516 (EP,KR);
H01M50/545 (EP);
H01M50/547 (EP);
H01M50/559 (EP);
B23K2101/36 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/01] | H01M50/566, H01M50/516, H01M50/167, H01M50/213, B23K26/0622, B23K26/359, B23K101/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZYLINDRISCHE BATTERIEZELLE MIT SPIRALFÖRMIGEM SCHWEISSTEIL UND BATTERIEMODUL DAMIT | [2024/01] | English: | CYLINDRICAL BATTERY CELL HAVING SPIRAL WELDING PART, AND BATTERY MODULE COMPRISING SAME | [2024/01] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE BATTERIE CYLINDRIQUE AYANT UNE PARTIE DE SOUDAGE EN SPIRALE, ET MODULE DE BATTERIE LE COMPRENANT | [2024/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2023 | Translation filed | 29.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2006100147 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]WO2015068353 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]KR20190008135 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2020523768 ; | [Y]KR20210025848 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | by applicant | KR20210142324 |