EP4340075 - MANUFACTURING METHOD OF POSITIVE ELECTRODE CURRENT COLLECTOR COATED WITH ADHESION ENHANCEMENT LAYER, POSITIVE ELECTRODE CURRENT COLLECTOR COATED WITH ADHESION ENHANCEMENT LAYER MANUFACTURED THEREBY, MANUFACTURING METHOD OF POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY MANUFACTURED THEREBY, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Min-Soo Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Su-Jin Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
SEO, Jung-Hyun Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
JUNG, Soon-Hwa Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/12] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22890249.0 | 24.10.2022 | [2024/12] | WO2022KR16295 | Priority number, date | KR20210150118 | 03.11.2021 Original published format: KR 20210150118 | KR20210150119 | 03.11.2021 Original published format: KR 20210150119 | [2024/12] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023080514 | Date: | 11.05.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4340075 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/66, H01M4/62, H01M4/139, H01M4/1397, H01M4/13, H01M4/136, H01M10/052, H01M4/58, H01M4/02 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M4/667 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (US);
H01M4/0404 (US);
H01M4/52 (EP);
H01M4/5825 (EP,US);
H01M4/623 (US);
H01M4/661 (EP,US);
H01M4/668 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR POSITIVELEKTRODE UND LITHIUM-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2024/12] | English: | MANUFACTURING METHOD OF POSITIVE ELECTRODE CURRENT COLLECTOR COATED WITH ADHESION ENHANCEMENT LAYER, POSITIVE ELECTRODE CURRENT COLLECTOR COATED WITH ADHESION ENHANCEMENT LAYER MANUFACTURED THEREBY, MANUFACTURING METHOD OF POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY MANUFACTURED THEREBY, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME | [2024/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COLLECTEUR DE COURANT D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE REVÊTU D'UNE COUCHE D'AMÉLIORATION D'ADHÉRENCE, COLLECTEUR DE COURANT D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE REVÊTU D'UNE COUCHE D'AMÉLIORATION D'ADHÉRENCE AINSI FABRIQUÉ, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM, ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM AINSI FABRIQUÉE, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM LA COMPRENANT | [2024/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2023 | Translation filed | 14.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2008084742 (NEC TOKIN CORP); | [A]KR20150045833 ; | [Y]KR20150050075 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20170045910 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20190109284 (SK INNOVATION CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | KR20210150118 | KR20210150119 |