EP4290732 - ELECTRIC RIDING VEHICLE PRODUCT ALLOWING EXTENDED USE OF BATTERY OF ELECTRIC RIDING VEHICLE AS ENERGY STORAGE POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.11.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 27.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accel Power Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. Room 2102, Tower E, Xinghe World Minle Coamunity, Minzhi Longhua District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Lirui Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22891182.2 | 13.05.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022CN92696 | Priority number, date | CN20222159764U | 29.04.2022 Original published format: CN 202221059764 U | [2023/50] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023206623 | Date: | 02.11.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4290732 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H02M7/00, H02M7/42, H02M7/66 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
H02J7/0013 (EP,US);
H02J7/0063 (EP,US);
B60L1/006 (EP,US);
B60L50/20 (EP);
B60L50/64 (EP);
B60L50/66 (EP);
B60L2200/12 (EP,US);
B62J43/28 (US);
B62J43/30 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES REITFAHRZEUGPRODUKT ZUR ERWEITERTEN VERWENDUNG EINER BATTERIE EINES ELEKTRISCHEN REITFAHRZEUGS ALS ENERGIESPEICHERSTROMVERSORGUNG | [2023/50] | English: | ELECTRIC RIDING VEHICLE PRODUCT ALLOWING EXTENDED USE OF BATTERY OF ELECTRIC RIDING VEHICLE AS ENERGY STORAGE POWER SUPPLY | [2023/50] | French: | PRODUIT POUR VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE PERMETTANT L'UTILISATION PROLONGÉE DE LA BATTERIE D'UN VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE COMME SOURCE D'ALIMENTATION À STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2023 | Translation filed | 18.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 28.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008018303 (SCHEUCHER KARL F [US]); | [X]CN201494324U (ENCAN ZHU); | [X]US2012007446 (RO HUNTAE [KR]); | [X]JP2013099200 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP); | [X]CN103503273 (PANASONIC COPORATION); | [A]CN206611196U (BEIJING HUITONGYIDA TECH CO LTD); | [PX]CN114421595 (SUZHOU GATHERING CLOUD NEW ENERGY SCIENCE AND TECH LIMITED COMPANY) |