EP4371280 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING SERVICE CONTINUITY POLICY CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hyesung Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Sungjin Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 22893176.2 | 09.11.2022 | [2024/21] | WO2022KR17523 | Priority number, date | KR20210153170 | 09.11.2021 Original published format: KR 20210153170 | [2024/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023085756 | Date: | 19.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4371280 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L41/0893, H04L41/147, H04L67/56, H04L67/1021, H04W88/18, H04W8/02 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
H04W60/00 (EP,US);
H04L41/0894 (EP,KR);
H04W24/04 (EP,US);
H04L41/147 (EP,KR);
H04L67/1021 (KR);
H04L67/56 (KR);
H04W12/086 (EP);
H04W12/30 (EP);
H04W4/50 (EP,US);
H04W60/04 (EP);
H04W8/02 (KR);
H04W88/182 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON DIENSTKONTINUITÄTSRICHTLINIENSTEUERUNG | [2024/21] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING SERVICE CONTINUITY POLICY CONTROL | [2024/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR PRENDRE EN CHARGE UNE COMMANDE DE POLITIQUE DE CONTINUITÉ DE SERVICE | [2024/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |