Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4441847 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP22902231 US2022051662W US202218072971



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4441847Global Dossier 09.10.2024A1
Priority number Date
WO2022US51662 02.12.2022
US202218072971 01.12.2022
US202163285582 03.12.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2023102187Global Dossier 08.06.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202218072971 01.12.2022
US202163285582 03.12.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US12113295Global Dossier 08.10.2024B2
US2023187824 15.06.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202218072971 01.12.2022
US202163285582 03.12.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW202335361 01.09.2023A
Priority number Date
US202218072971 01.12.2022
US202163285582 03.12.2021