EP4318697 - ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, AND BATTERY CELL COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | 05.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ENERGY SOLUTION, LTD. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Hyeok Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
JANG, Seokhoon Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Su Taek Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
BAE, Sangho Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22904572.9 | 02.12.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022KR19462 | Priority number, date | KR20210173204 | 06.12.2021 Original published format: KR 20210173204 | KR20220165842 | 01.12.2022 Original published format: KR 20220165842 | [2024/06] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023106742 | Date: | 15.06.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4318697 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
H01M10/04 (EP);
H01M50/461 (EP,US);
H01M10/0431 (US);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M50/409 (EP);
H01M50/463 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENANORDNUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND BATTERIEZELLE DAMIT | [2024/06] | English: | ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, AND BATTERY CELL COMPRISING SAME | [2024/06] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ÉLECTRODES, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET ÉLÉMENT DE BATTERIE LE COMPRENANT | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.2023 | Translation filed | 01.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 01.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2011216408 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2018506593 ; | [Y]JP2019001936 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [Y]KR20200058222 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20210065655 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) |