EP4357903 - METHOD FOR MANAGING MEMORY AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIM, Geunsik Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
HAM, Myungjoo Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 22911762.7 | 14.12.2022 | [2024/17] | WO2022KR20344 | Priority number, date | KR20210186591 | 23.12.2021 Original published format: KR 20210186591 | KR20220075779 | 21.06.2022 Original published format: KR 20220075779 | [2024/17] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023121129 | Date: | 29.06.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4357903 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, G06F12/02 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
G06F12/0246 (EP);
G06F3/0611 (US);
G06F3/0644 (US);
G06F3/0679 (US);
G06F2212/1016 (EP);
G06F2212/205 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SPEICHERVERWALTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2024/17] | English: | METHOD FOR MANAGING MEMORY AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING SAME | [2024/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE MÉMOIRE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE L'UTILISANT | [2024/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2024 | Translation filed | 17.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR20120069475 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]) [Y] 1-5,11-15 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0033] and figure 2. *; | [A]WO2014104509 (UNIV KOREA RES & BUS FOUND [KR]) [A] 1-15* See claims 1-6 and figure 1. *; | [Y]KR101924022B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. et al.) [Y] 3,5,13,15 * See paragraphs [0045]-[0061] and figure 4. *; | [A]KR20190117294 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0047]-[0087] and figure 1. *; | [YA]KR20200056046 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-5,11-15 * See paragraphs [0053]-[0145] and figures 2 and 3. * [A] 6-10 |