EP4345760 - INTERACTION METHOD AND APPARATUS IN THREE-DIMENSIONAL SPACE, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Yibao Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
CUI, Qiaoyun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Jinjun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | Deambrogi, Edgardo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 22913398.8 | 16.08.2022 | [2024/14] | WO2022CN112861 | Priority number, date | CN202111679046 | 31.12.2021 Original published format: CN202111679046 | [2024/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023124113 | Date: | 06.07.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4345760 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T19/00, A63F13/52, G06F3/01 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
A63F13/213 (EP);
G06F3/011 (EP,CN);
A63F13/428 (EP);
A63F13/573 (EP);
A63F13/577 (EP);
A63F13/65 (EP);
G06F3/017 (EP,CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTERAKTIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG IM DREIDIMENSIONALEN RAUM, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2024/14] | English: | INTERACTION METHOD AND APPARATUS IN THREE-DIMENSIONAL SPACE, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2024/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'INTERACTION DANS UN ESPACE TRIDIMENSIONNEL, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2024/14] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2023 | Translation filed | 29.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |