EP4342519 - MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Mindray Bio-Medical Electronics Co., Ltd Mindray Building Keji 12th Road South High-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOU, Xiaoling Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Lei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
JI, Baimiao Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
DING, Yanqiong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | KIPA AB Drottninggatan 11 252 21 Helsingborg / SE | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 22913615.5 | 08.10.2022 | [2024/13] | WO2022CN123844 | Priority number, date | CN202111664247 | 31.12.2021 Original published format: CN202111664247 | [2024/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023124351 | Date: | 06.07.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4342519 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/39 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
A61N1/3904 (EP);
A61N1/3993 (EP);
G06F3/0482 (EP);
G06F3/0484 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP);
A61N1/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2024/13] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE | [2024/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2023 | Translation filed | 17.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |