EP4358179 - SILICON NEGATIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL, AND SECONDARY BATTERY, BATTERY MODULE, BATTERY PACK AND ELECTRIC DEVICE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology (Hong Kong) Limited Level 19, China Building 29 Queen's Road Central Central, Central And Western District / HK | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/17] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No.2 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Yale Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Ming Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Jimin Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 22918303.3 | 24.11.2022 | [2024/17] | WO2022CN133924 | Priority number, date | CN20221004942 | 04.01.2022 Original published format: CN202210004942 | [2024/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023130851 | Date: | 13.07.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4358179 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/134 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,CN);
H01M4/366 (CN);
B82Y40/00 (EP,CN);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN);
H01M4/134 (EP);
H01M4/36 (EP);
H01M4/38 (EP);
H01M4/386 (CN);
H01M4/48 (EP);
H01M4/483 (CN);
H01M4/62 (EP);
H01M4/625 (CN);
H01M4/628 (CN);
H01M2004/027 (CN);
H01M2220/10 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEGATIVES SILICIUMELEKTRODENMATERIAL UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, BATTERIEMODUL, BATTERIEPACK UND ELEKTRISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2024/17] | English: | SILICON NEGATIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL, AND SECONDARY BATTERY, BATTERY MODULE, BATTERY PACK AND ELECTRIC DEVICE COMPRISING SAME | [2024/17] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE EN SILICIUM, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE, MODULE DE BATTERIE, BATTERIE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRIQUE LA COMPRENANT | [2024/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2024 | Translation filed | 18.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |