Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20240017157 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022CN114490 | 24.08.2022 | CN202210904879 | 29.07.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3209011 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022CN114490 | 24.08.2022 | CN202210904879 | 29.07.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4339978 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022CN114490 | 24.08.2022 | CN202210904879 | 29.07.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2023010224 | 27.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022CN114490 | 24.08.2022 | CN202210904879 | 29.07.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2024021210 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202210904879 | 29.07.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115148503 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202210904879 | 29.07.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202405839 | 01.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202210904879 | 29.07.2022 |