Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.03.2025 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.12.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.01.2025 [2025/04] |
20.12.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.01.2025 [2025/04] |
25.11.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.08.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.08.2024 | Change - representative | |
22.08.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.08.2024 | Change - representative | |
21.08.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.08.2024 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
22.09.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.09.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor |