EP4245605 - ARRANGEMENT FOR TOWING CART INTO TRUNK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pickdelso Oy Liljatie 31 b A 01300 Vantaa / FI | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saviranta, Tapio 01300, Vantaa / FI | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 23020076.8 | 14.02.2023 | [2023/38] | Priority number, date | FI20220007039 | 18.03.2022 Original published format: FI 20227039 | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4245605 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/00, B60P1/64, B60P7/08, B62B5/00 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
B60P1/003 (EP);
B60P1/6454 (EP,AU);
B60P1/43 (AU);
B60P1/6409 (EP,AU);
B60P1/6427 (EP,AU);
B60P3/06 (AU);
B60P7/0853 (EP);
B62B5/0003 (EP);
B66D1/00 (AU);
B60P1/649 (AU)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUM EINSCHLEPPEN EINES WAGENS IN DEN KOFFERRAUM | [2023/38] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR TOWING CART INTO TRUNK | [2023/38] | French: | AGENCEMENT POUR REMORQUER UN CHARIOT DANS UN COFFRE | [2023/38] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/38] | 25.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 21.04.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.04.2023 | Decision despatched |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5624137 (LESESNE EDWARD R [PA]); | [Y]US2004202533 (HAIRE A RALPH [US]); | [YD]US8084993 (WONG THOMAS K [US]); | [YD]US2021129607 (BROWN DAVID GEORGE [US]) | by applicant | US5829945 | US6524056 | US8084993 | US2021129607 |