EP4209384 - NON-CONTACT ELECTRIC POWER TRANSFER DEVICE, FLYING VEHICLE PROVIDED WITH RECHARGEABLE BATTERIES, AND ELECTRIC RECHARGING BASE PROVIDED WITH SAID ELECTRIC POWER TRANSFER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus SAS 2 Rond-Point Emile Dewoitine 31700 Blagnac / FR | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHASSAIGNE, Didier 31700 BLAGNAC / FR | 02 /
PERRAUD, Richard 31700 BLAGNAC / FR | 03 /
REVEL, Ivan 31700 BLAGNAC / FR | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Fantin, Laurent ALLICI Gare de Bordeaux Saint-Jean Pavillon Nord - Parvis Louis Armand CS 21912 33082 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 23150072.9 | 03.01.2023 | [2023/28] | Priority number, date | FR20220000137 | 10.01.2022 Original published format: FR 2200137 | [2023/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4209384 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/12, B60L53/36, B64D27/00, B64D31/00, H01F27/00, H01F27/32, H01F27/36, H01F38/14, B60L53/122, B60L53/126, B60L53/38, B64C39/00, B64F1/00, H02J50/10, B64F1/36, B64U50/19, H02J7/00, H02J7/02, H02J50/00, H02J50/40 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
B60L53/12 (EP);
H02J50/10 (EP,US);
B60L53/122 (EP);
B60L53/126 (EP);
B60L53/36 (EP);
B60L53/38 (EP);
B60R16/033 (US);
B64U50/38 (EP);
B64U80/25 (EP);
H01F27/366 (EP);
H01F27/38 (US);
H01F38/14 (EP);
H02J50/005 (EP,US);
H02J50/40 (EP,US);
B60L2200/10 (EP);
B64F1/007 (EP);
B64U10/13 (EP);
H02J7/0042 (EP);
H02J7/02 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] |
Former [2023/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTAKTLOSE STROMÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, LUFTFAHRZEUG MIT WIEDERAUFLADBAREN BATTERIEN UND ELEKTRISCHE LADEBASIS MIT DER STROMÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/28] | English: | NON-CONTACT ELECTRIC POWER TRANSFER DEVICE, FLYING VEHICLE PROVIDED WITH RECHARGEABLE BATTERIES, AND ELECTRIC RECHARGING BASE PROVIDED WITH SAID ELECTRIC POWER TRANSFER DEVICE | [2023/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE SANS CONTACT, VÉHICULE VOLANT POURVU DE BATTERIES RECHARGEABLES ET BASE DE RECHARGE ÉLECTRIQUE ÉQUIPÉS DUDIT DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/28] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 05.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014042789 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract; figures 1-25; claims 1-34 * * page 6 - page 51 *; | [I]KR20160015716 (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [I] 1-15 * abstract; figures 1-11; claims 1-15 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0075] *; | [I]US2018056794 (KIM JOUNG HO [KR], et al) [I] 1,14,15 * abstract; figures 1-3,5A; claims 1-20 * * page 3 - page 7 *; | [A]CN108688496 (HARBIN INST TECHNOLOGY WEIHAI, et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2020055599 (KODAIRA YASUMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract; figures 1-12; claims 15-28 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0058] * |