EP4218801 - ANTIBODY MODIFICATION METHOD FOR PURIFYING BISPECIFIC ANTIBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGAWA, Tomoyuki Shizuoka, 412-8513 / JP | 02 /
TSUNODA, Hiroyuki Shizuoka, 412-8513 / JP | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23150077.8 | 30.03.2007 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | JP20060097795 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006097795 | JP20060275804 | 06.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006275804 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4218801 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4218801 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61P43/00, C07K16/00, C07K19/00, C12N1/15, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N15/09, C12N5/10, C12P21/02 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/248 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
C07K2317/522 (EP,US);
C07K2317/524 (EP,US);
C07K2317/526 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2317/567 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2024/13] |
Former [2023/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPERMODIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG EINES BISPEZIFISCHEN ANTIKÖRPERS | [2023/31] | English: | ANTIBODY MODIFICATION METHOD FOR PURIFYING BISPECIFIC ANTIBODY | [2023/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MODIFICATION D'ANTICORPS POUR PURIFIER UN ANTICORPS BISPÉCIFIQUE | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/13] | 16.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07740494.5 / EP2009101 | EP17196942.1 / EP3345616 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1870459 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | by applicant | JPH02504970 | EP0125023 | EP0239400 | JPH0159878B | EP0404097 | WO9201047 | WO9203918 | WO9219759 | WO9220791 | WO9306213 | WO9311161 | WO9311236 | WO9312227 | WO9319172 | WO9402602 | WO9501438 | WO9515393 | WO9515388 | WO9602576 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | WO9813388 | WO9846777 | WO9951743 | JP2005112514 |