EP4210191 - ENERGY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR A RECREATIONAL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spivak, Paul 1148 East 222nd Street Euclid, OH 44117 / US | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/28] | Ashdown, Matthew Lucas & Co 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 23150198.2 | 03.01.2023 | [2023/28] | Priority number, date | US202217568878 | 05.01.2022 Original published format: US202217568878 | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4210191 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/14, B60L1/00, B60L1/14, H02J3/14 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
H02J1/14 (EP);
H02J3/144 (US);
B60L1/003 (EP);
B60L1/14 (EP);
B60R16/03 (US);
H02M7/04 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/05] |
Former [2023/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN FREIZEITFAHRZEUG | [2023/28] | English: | ENERGY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR A RECREATIONAL VEHICLE | [2023/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION D'ÉNERGIE POUR UN VÉHICULE DE LOISIRS | [2023/28] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/05] | 22.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4499385 (SLAVIK WILLIAM H [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US4617472 (SLAVIK WILLIAM H [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2005141154 (CONSADORI FRANCO [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0130] * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]US7373222 (WRIGHT KEVIN P [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]US2013197748 (WHITAKER CHUCK C [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-15; | [I]US11183843 (COOPER J CARL [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * |