blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4216393

EP4216393 - HYDROGEN SYSTEM OPERATION PLANNING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.08.2024
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2024Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.09.2024  [2024/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toshiba Energy Systems & Solutions Corporation
72-34, Horikawa-cho
Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 2120013 / JP
[2023/30]
Inventor(s)01 / AKIBA, Takashi
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 212-0013 / JP
02 / TAMARU, Shingo
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 212-0013 / JP
03 / YAMANE, Fumiyuki
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 212-0013 / JP
04 / BABA, Junsuke
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 212-0013 / JP
 [2023/30]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2023/30]
Application number, filing date23150419.205.01.2023
[2023/30]
Priority number, dateJP2022000782821.01.2022         Original published format: JP 2022007828
[2023/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP4216393
Date:26.07.2023
Language:EN
[2023/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP4216393
Date:18.10.2023
Language:EN
[2023/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2023
ClassificationIPC:H02J3/14, H02J15/00
[2023/30]
CPC:
H02J3/144 (EP); H01M8/04925 (US); G05B19/042 (US);
H01M8/0656 (US); H02J15/008 (EP); H02J3/28 (EP);
G05B2219/2639 (US); H02J2300/20 (EP); H02J2300/30 (EP);
H02J2310/54 (EP); H02J2310/60 (EP); H02J3/381 (EP);
Y02E60/36 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WASSERSTOFFSYSTEMBETRIEBSPLANUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2023/30]
English:HYDROGEN SYSTEM OPERATION PLANNING DEVICE[2023/30]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PLANIFICATION DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE SYSTÈME D'HYDROGÈNE[2023/30]
Examination procedure05.01.2023Examination requested  [2023/30]
19.04.2024Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2024/38]
13.05.2024Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2024/38]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2016125339  (ITAYA NOBUHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0007] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] * * paragraph [0033]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0061] , [0069] * * claims 1-6 * * figures 1,4,7 *;
 [A]US2017317502  (ITO AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0010] - [0012] - [0027] - [0029] - [0042] - [0043] - [0049] - [0065] - [0099] * * claims 1-5 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]WO2018069993  (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0005] , [0006] , [0029] , [0031] , [0092] - [0097]; figures 1,2,12 * * claims 1,6 *;
 [A]JP2019170097  (TOKYO GAS CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0018] - [0020] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0043] - [0046] - [0049] , [0050] - [0054] * * claims 1-4 * * claim 5 * * claims 6-7 *;
 [A]US2021405603  (NAGINO GOSHU [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * figure 1 * * claims 1,6,8,10,11 * * paragraphs [0104] , [0137] - [0139] - [0152] , [0197] , [0222] ** paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0021] , [0022] , [0031] , [0043] - [0047] - [0100] *
by applicantWO2020179849
 WO2020203520
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.