Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] |
26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
16.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | |
09.02.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
09.02.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
17.12.2023 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
17.11.2023 | Change - classification | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
17.11.2023 | Change - classification | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
27.09.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
27.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.08.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
04.08.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
10.01.2023 | Change - representative |