Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4401273 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4401273



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(36)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 124
18.03.2025 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
06.02.2025 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.01.2025 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.01.2025 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.01.2025 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
24.01.2025 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
24.01.2025 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.11.2024 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
26.11.2024 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
26.11.2024 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
26.11.2024 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.11.2024 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 16
26.11.2024 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 16
11.11.2024 Examination started Search / examination 1
22.07.2024 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.06.2024 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
27.12.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.12.2023 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
27.12.2023 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
27.12.2023 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 10
27.12.2023 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 10
27.12.2023 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
27.12.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.06.2023 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.06.2023 European search opinion Search / examination 3
23.06.2023 European search report Search / examination 2
23.06.2023 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
17.06.2023 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
01.06.2023 Search started Search / examination 1
10.01.2023 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.01.2023 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
10.01.2023 Claims Search / examination 3
10.01.2023 Description Search / examination 10
10.01.2023 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.01.2023 Drawings Search / examination 3
10.01.2023 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4