blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4184851

EP4184851 - SYSTEM INFORMATION FOR CHANGING A CONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.12.2023
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.04.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Motorola Mobility LLC
222 W. Merchandise Mart Plaza Suite 1800
Chicago, IL 60654 / US
[2023/21]
Inventor(s)01 / BASU MALLICK, Prateek
63225 Langen / DE
02 / LOEHR, Joachim
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
03 / KUCHIBHOTLA, Ravi
Clarendon Hills, 60514 / US
 [2023/21]
Representative(s)Openshaw & Co.
8 Castle Street
Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
[2023/21]
Application number, filing date23151424.120.03.2018
[2023/21]
Priority number, dateUS20171546407320.03.2017         Original published format: US201715464073
[2023/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4184851
Date:24.05.2023
Language:EN
[2023/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2023
ClassificationIPC:H04L5/00
[2023/21]
CPC:
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN,US); H04L5/0096 (CN); H04L41/0813 (CN,US);
H04L5/0091 (EP,US); H04W80/00 (CN,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/01]
Former [2023/21]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEMINFORMATIONEN ZUM ÄNDERN EINER KONFIGURATION[2023/21]
English:SYSTEM INFORMATION FOR CHANGING A CONFIGURATION[2023/21]
French:INFORMATIONS SYSTÈME POUR CHANGER UNE CONFIGURATION[2023/21]
Examination procedure24.11.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.11.2023Examination requested  [2024/01]
24.11.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP18716750.7  / EP3602922
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
12.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
12.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 07
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2016234736  (KUBOTA KEIICHI [GB], et al);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.