EP4213211 - DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jaewon 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Min, Junyoung 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Choi, Junwon 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Park, Okkyung 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si / KR | 05 /
Pyon, Changsoo 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si / KR | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 23151444.9 | 13.01.2023 | [2023/29] | Priority number, date | KR20220006179 | 14.01.2022 Original published format: KR 20220006179 | [2023/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4213211 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/12, H10K59/121 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
H01L27/1214 (EP);
H10K59/131 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/1255 (EP);
H10K59/121 (KR);
H10K59/1213 (EP,US);
H10K59/1216 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0426 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEGERÄT | [2023/29] | English: | DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2023/29] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE | [2023/29] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 17.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US9000424 (MOON SUNG-HOON [KR]); | [A]US10566402 (CHO SEUNGHWAN [KR], et al); | [A]US2020135831 (BAE JOON WOO [KR], et al); | [A]US11075226 (CHEN YUN-SHENG [TW], et al) |