EP4212720 - TOWER FOR A WIND TURBINE AND CORRESPONDING WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bettels Betonfertigteile GmbH Zum Südkai 24 26723 Emden / DE | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRACKE, Olaf 26725 Emden / DE | 02 /
BÖTTGER, Michael 58455 Witten / DE | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 23151574.3 | 13.01.2023 | [2023/29] | Priority number, date | DE202210100725 | 13.01.2022 Original published format: DE102022100725 | [2023/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4212720 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F03D9/12, F03D13/20, F03D80/00, F03D13/10 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
F03D9/12 (EP);
F03D13/10 (EP);
F03D13/20 (EP);
F03D80/00 (EP);
F05B2260/96 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] |
Former [2023/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TURM FÜR EINE WINDENERGIEANLAGE UND BETREFFENDE WINDENERGIEANLAGE | [2023/29] | English: | TOWER FOR A WIND TURBINE AND CORRESPONDING WIND TURBINE | [2023/29] | French: | TOUR POUR UNE ÉOLIENNE ET ÉOLIENNE CORRESPONDANTE | [2023/29] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 19.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1606514 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]); | [A]EP1008747 (MITSCH FRANZ [DE]); | [X]WO2013098086 (WERNER ROLF J [DE]); | [XI]EP2764185 (MAX BÖGL WIND AG [DE]); | [A]EP3048295 (SENVION GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO2019076586 (INNOGY SE [DE]); | [X]EP3495589 (SENVION GMBH [DE]) |