EP4218512 - GRINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/31] | SMALL GRINDER | ||
[2024/14] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningbo Chefshere Kitchen Technology Co., Ltd. No.59 Kechuang N. Road Jishigang, Haishu District Ningbo, Zhejiang 315000 / CN | [2024/16] |
Former [2023/31] | For all designated states Ningbo Chefshere Kitchen Technology Co., Ltd No.59 Kechuang N.Road Jishigang Haishu District Ningbo, Zhejiang 315000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhang, Chao Ningbo, Zhejiang 315000 / CN | [2024/16] |
Former [2023/31] | 01 /
Zhang, Chao Ningbo, Zhejiang, 315000 / CN | Representative(s) | karo IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Steinstraße 16-18 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/31] | karo IP karo IP Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels PartG mbB Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 23151857.2 | 16.01.2023 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | CN202220228557U | 27.01.2022 Original published format: CN 202220228557 U | [2023/31] | Previously filed application, date | CN202220228557U | 27.01.2022 | [2023/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4218512 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4218512 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47J42/06, A47J42/08, // A47J42/50 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
A47J42/06 (EP,US);
B24B23/022 (US);
A47J42/08 (EP);
A47J42/50 (EP,US);
B24B47/12 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/31] | A47J42/06, // A47J42/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MAHLMÜHLE | [2024/16] | English: | GRINDER | [2024/14] | French: | MOULIN | [2024/14] |
Former [2023/31] | KLEINSCHLEIFGERÄT | ||
Former [2023/31] | SMALL GRINDER | ||
Former [2023/31] | MEULEUSE DE PETITE TAILLE | Examination procedure | 29.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 29.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2010308141 (BICH FRANCOIS [FR]); | [A]WO2012120363 (CERRETI GIANFRANCO [IT]); | [XAI]US8960580 (ZHANG GUOPING [CN]); | [A]KR101968520B (RINO CORP [KR]) |