EP4216233 - NUCLEAR LIGHT WATER REACTOR, IN PARTICULAR PRESSURIZED WATER OR BOILING WATER, WITH A COLD GROUND SOURCE, AND INTEGRATING AN AUTONOMOUS RESIDUAL POWER DRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/30] | NUCLEAR LIGHT WATER REACTOR, IN PARTICULAR PRESSURIZED WATER OR BOILING WATER, WITH A COLD GROUND SOURCE, AND INTEGRATING AN AUTONOMOUS RESIDUAL POWER DRAIN | ||
[2023/41] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/30] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LHERMET, GUILLAUME 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | 02 /
CANEY, Nadia 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | 03 /
MORIN, Franck 13115 SAINT PAUL LEZ DURANCE / FR | 04 /
TAUVERON, Nicolas 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 23151912.5 | 17.01.2023 | [2023/30] | Priority number, date | FR20220000436 | 19.01.2022 Original published format: FR 2200436 | [2023/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4216233 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4216233 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G21C1/08, G21C15/18 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
G21C15/185 (EP);
G21C15/18 (KR);
G21C15/14 (CN);
G21C1/324 (US);
F01K23/02 (KR);
F01K3/181 (KR);
F01K9/003 (KR);
F25B25/005 (KR);
G21C1/08 (KR);
G21C1/084 (EP);
G21C1/086 (EP);
G21C15/243 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEICHTWASSERREAKTOR, INSBESONDERE DRUCKWASSERREAKTOR ODER SIEDEWASSERREAKTOR, MIT KÄLTEQUELLE IM BODEN UND UNABHÄNGIGEM SYSTEM ZUR ABFUHR VON RESTLEISTUNG | [2023/30] | English: | NUCLEAR LIGHT WATER REACTOR, IN PARTICULAR PRESSURIZED WATER OR BOILING WATER, WITH A COLD GROUND SOURCE, AND INTEGRATING AN AUTONOMOUS RESIDUAL POWER DRAIN | [2023/41] | French: | RÉACTEUR NUCLÉAIRE À EAU LÉGÈRE, NOTAMMENT À EAU PRESSURISÉE OU À EAU BOUILLANTE, À SOURCE FROIDE AU SOL ET INTÉGRANT UN SYSTÈME AUTONOME D'ÉVACUATION DE LA PUISSANCE RÉSIDUELLE | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/30] | NUCLEAR LIGHT WATER REACTOR, IN PARTICULAR PRESSURIZED WATER OR BOILING WATER, WITH A COLD GROUND SOURCE, AND INTEGRATING AN AUTONOMOUS RESIDUAL POWER DRAIN | Examination procedure | 17.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 28.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN109166637 (UNIV NORTH CHINA ELECTRIC POWER) [I] 1-3,6-9* cf fig 1et sa description, titre * | by applicant | WO2012145406 | WO2013019589 | - S. KADALEV et al., Annals of Nuclear Energy, (20140000), vol. 72, pages 182 - 188 | - D.C. SUNY. LIZ. XIY.F. ZANP.Z. LIW.B. ZHUO, "Experimental évaluation of safety performance of emergency passive residual heat removal system in HPR1000", Nuclear Engineering and Design, vol. 318, doi:10.1016/j.nucengdes.2017.04.003, ISSN 0029-5493, (20170000), pages 54 - 60, URL: https://doi.org/10.1016/j.nucengdes.2017.04.003, XP085042501 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nucengdes.2017.04.003 | - MIKHAIL MALTSEV, Additional information on modem VVER Gen III technology, (20150000), URL: https://www.oecd-nea.org/upload/docs/application/pdf/2020-07/ii-la-maltesev.pdf | - DAVID HINDSCHRIS MASLAK, "Next-generation nuclear energy: The ESBWR", Nuclear News, (20060100), URL: https://www-pub.iaea.org/MTCD/Publications/PDF/te_1624_web.pdf |