Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
14.02.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | |
02.02.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
31.01.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
31.01.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
31.01.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | |
31.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.10.2023 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
18.08.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
18.08.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
18.08.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
17.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
05.05.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
31.01.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.01.2023 | Change - representative |