EP4191058 - METHOD FOR MEASURING IMBALANCES AND ANGLES OF ATTACK AND HALF-PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 06.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Filing of request for unitary effect | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Windcomp GmbH Glogauer Straße 21 10999 Berlin / DE | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUCKS, Christoph 22303 Hamburg / DE | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 23152372.1 | 29.12.2017 | [2023/23] | Procedural language | DE | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 05.04.2024 | Date of request for unitary effect [2024/20] | 15.04.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/20] | 15.04.2024 | Date of registration [2024/20] | 13.03.2024 | Date of legal effect [2024/20] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 15.04.2024 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2024/20] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4191058 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/11] |