EP4219744 - METHODS OF PREPARING NUCLEIC ACIDS FOR SEQUENCING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | For all designated states ArcherDX, LLC 1400 16th Street San Francisco, CA 91403 / US | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iafrate, Anthony, John Newton, 02465 / US | 02 /
Le, Long Phi Charlestown, 02129 / US | 03 /
Zheng, Zongli Boston, 02114 / US | 04 /
Myers, Jason Boulder, 80301 / US | 05 /
Stahl, Joshua Boulder, 80301 / US | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23152512.2 | 26.01.2015 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | US201461931959P | 27.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461931959 P | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4219744 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4219744 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12Q1/6806 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6806 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6809 (US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2535/122 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/31] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NUKLEINSÄUREN ZUR SEQUENZIERUNG | [2023/31] | English: | METHODS OF PREPARING NUCLEIC ACIDS FOR SEQUENCING | [2023/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES POUR LE SÉQUENÇAGE | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/14] | 28.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 20.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15740988.9 / EP3099820 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.05.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 20.05.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.05.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU2005203617 (NUGEN TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 55, lines 12-25; Fig. 6a and 6b *; | [A]US2009203085 (KURN NURITH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * Fig. 13, steps II and III *; | [A]WO2012064739 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * Fig. 3a and 3b *; | [A] - CALLAWAY A S ET AL, "A Sobemovirus coat protein gene complements long-distance movement of a coat protein-null Dianthovirus", VIRO, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20041205), vol. 330, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.VIROL.2004.09.037, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 186 - 195, XP004620820 [A] 1-15 * par. bridging pages 192 and 193 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2004.09.037 | [I] - ZHEN WANG ET AL, "Fusion primer and nested integrated PCR (FPNI-PCR): a new high-efficiency strategy for rapid chromosome walking or flanking sequence cloning", BMC BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20110101), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1472-6750-11-109, ISSN 1472-6750, page 109, XP055015224 [I] 1-15 * Fig. 1a; Fig. 2; page 11, left col.; last par. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6750-11-109 | [A] - V. C. GOULD ET AL, "Analysis of sequence variation among smeDEF multi drug efflux pump genes and flanking DNA from defined 16S rRNA subgroups of clinical Stenotrophomonas maltophilia isolates", JOURNAL OF ANTIMICROBIAL CHEMOTHERAPY, (20040714), vol. 54, no. 2, doi:10.1093/jac/dkh367, pages 348 - 353, XP055428129 [A] 1-15 * page 349m "Polymerase chain reaction protocols" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jac/dkh367 | [A] - YAO-GUANG LIU ET AL, "High-efficiency thermal asymmetric interlaced PCR for amplification of unknown flanking sequences", BIOTECHNIQUES RAPID DISPATCHES, US, (20071101), vol. 43, no. 5, doi:10.2144/000112601, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 649 - 656, XP055428052 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2144/000112601 | [I] - WANG ZHEN ET AL, "Supplementary data for: Zhen Wang; Shafei Ye; Jingjing Li; Bo Zheng; Manzhu Bao; Guogui Ning Fusion primer and nested integrated PCR (FPNI-PCR): a new high-efficiency strategy for rapid chromosome walking or flanking sequence cloning XP055015224", BMC BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20110101), vol. 11, no. 109, pages 1 - 12, XP055972278 [I] 1-15 * Table S2; Table S3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6750-11-109 | by applicant | WO2004079326 | US6818395 | US6911345 | WO2006034833 | US2006252077 | US7169560 | US2007070349 | US7220549 | US7226720 | US7279563 | US7282337 | US2011201598 | US8067434 | - FRIEIR et al., PNAS, (19860000), vol. 83, pages 9373 - 9377 | - SHENDURE et al., "Next-generation DNA sequencing", Nature, (20080000), vol. 26, no. 10, doi:10.1038/nbt1486, pages 1135 - 1145, XP002572506 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1486 | - MARDIS, "The impact of next-generation sequencing technology on genetics", Trends in Genetics, (20070000), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 133 - 141, XP022498431 | - SU et al., "Next-generation sequencing and its applications in molecular diagnostics", Expert Rev Mol Diagn, (20110000), vol. 11, no. 3, doi:10.1586/erm.11.3, pages 333 - 43, XP009505883 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/erm.11.3 | - ZHANG et al., "The impact of next-generation sequencing on genomics", J Genet Genomics, (20110000), vol. 38, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.jgg.2011.02.003, pages 95 - 109, XP028188028 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jgg.2011.02.003 | - NYREN, P. et al., Anal Biochem, (19930000), vol. 208, page 17175 | - BENTLEY, D. R., Curr Opin Genet Dev, (20060000), vol. 16, pages 545 - 52 | - STRAUSBERG, R. L. et al., Drug Disc Today, (20080000), vol. 13, pages 569 - 77 | - SODA et al., Nature, (20070000), pages 448561 - 6 | - RIKOVA et al., Cell, (20070000), vol. 131, pages 1190 - 1203 | - TAKOUCHI et al., Nature Medicine, (20120000), vol. 18, pages 378 - 81 | - GALKIN et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20070000), vol. 104, pages 270 - 275 | - ZOU et al., Cancer Res, (20070000), vol. 67, pages 4408 - 4417 | - HALLBERGPALMER, F1000 Med Reports, (20110000), vol. 3, page 21 | - SAKAMOTO et al., Cancer Cell, (20110000), vol. 19, pages 679 - 690 | - "NCBI Gene", Database accession no. 5979 | - SAMADI et al., Surgery, (20100000), vol. 148, pages 1228 - 36 | - CUCCURU et al., JNCI, (20040000), vol. 13, pages 1006 - 1014 | - AKENO-STUART et al., Cancer Research, (20070000), vol. 67, page 6956 | - GRAZMA et al., J Clin Oncol, (20100000), vol. 28, no. 15s, page 5559 | - MOLOGNI, J Mol Endocrinol, (20060000), vol. 37, pages 199 - 212 | - CALMOMAGNO et al., Journal NCI, (20060000), vol. 98, pages 326 - 334 | - MOLOGNI, Curr Med Chem, (20110000), vol. 18, pages 162 - 175 | - Agnew, Chem. Intl. Ed. Engl., (19940000), vol. 33, pages 183 - 186 | WO2015US12891 |