EP4197351 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING SMOKING ARTICLES, SEMI-FINISHED SMOKING ARTICLES AND SMOKING ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Körber Technologies GmbH Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOLGER, Manfred 21035 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
PANZ, Andreas 21502 Geesthacht / DE | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Seemann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 23152847.2 | 14.06.2018 | [2023/25] | Priority number, date | DE20171005787 | 21.06.2017 Original published format: DE102017005787 | [2023/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4197351 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/02, A24C5/47 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
A24D3/0287 (EP);
A24C5/475 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON RAUCHARTIKELPRODUKTEN, SOWIE RAUCHARTIKELPRODUKTE UND DEREN ZWISCHENPRODUKTE | [2023/25] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING SMOKING ARTICLES, SEMI-FINISHED SMOKING ARTICLES AND SMOKING ARTICLES | [2023/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PRODUITS POUR ARTICLES À FUMER, PRODUITS INTERMÉDIARES ET PRODUITS POUR ARTICLES À FUMER | [2023/25] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 18.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18733538.5 / EP3641572 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1127778 (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]GB2259847 (MOLINS PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 27 - page 5, line 28; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE102004006434 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0027] - [0034] , [0035]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | EP1441604 | WO2014064655 |