EP4192014 - REPRESENTING MOTION VECTORS IN AN ENCODED BITSTREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILKIN, Sergey Redmond, 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
SABLIN, Sergey Redmond, 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
ZHOU, You Redmond, 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
LIN, Chih-Lung Redmond, 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
LEE, Ming-Chieh Redmond, 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
SULLIVAN, Gary J. Redmond, 98052-6399 / US | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 23152981.9 | 07.01.2015 | [2023/23] | Priority number, date | US201461925108P | 08.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461925108 P | US201461934506P | 31.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461934506 P | US201414530625 | 31.10.2014 Original published format: US201414530625 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4192014 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/523, H04N19/70, H04N19/52, H04N19/513, H04N19/43 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
H04N19/523 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
G06T7/00 (RU);
H04N19/53 (KR);
H04N19/52 (EP,CN,US);
G06T7/20 (RU);
H04N19/172 (RU);
H04N19/174 (KR);
H04N19/30 (RU);
H04N19/43 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/44 (KR,RU);
H04N19/46 (RU);
H04N19/51 (RU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | DARSTELLUNG VON BEWEGUNGSVEKTOREN IN EINEM KODIERTEN BITSTROM | [2023/23] | English: | REPRESENTING MOTION VECTORS IN AN ENCODED BITSTREAM | [2023/23] | French: | REPRÉSENTATION DE VECTEURS DE MOUVEMENT DANS UN TRAIN DE BITS CODÉ | [2023/23] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 12.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15703132.9 / EP3075156 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008137753 (HE ZHONGLI [US]); | [A]US2008310511 (SUZUKI YOSHINORI [JP]); | [A]WO2011046587 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al); | [A]US2011206125 (CHIEN WEI-JUNG [US], et al); | [A]US2012207227 (TSAI CHIA-YANG [TW], et al); | [Y]US2013003849 (CHIEN WEI-JUNG [US], et al); | [A]US2013188733 (VAN DER AUWERA GEERT [US], et al); |