EP4148577 - METHOD AND APPARATUS OF RESPONDING TO CLIENT FAULT DETECTION WITH UPDATE OPERATION, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Baidu Netcom Science Technology Co., Ltd. 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeng, Zhigang Beijing, 100085 / CN | 02 /
Sun, Zhenyuan Beijing, 100085 / CN | 03 /
Shao, Bingqing Beijing, 100085 / CN | 04 /
Yan, Pengfei Beijing, 100085 / CN | 05 /
Li, Shiyong Beijing, 100085 / CN | 06 /
Wang, Yanpeng Beijing, 100085 / CN | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 23153051.0 | 24.01.2023 | [2023/11] | Priority number, date | CN202210195107 | 28.02.2022 Original published format: CN202210195107 | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4148577 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4148577 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/07 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
G06F11/0757 (EP);
H04L41/28 (KR);
G06F11/0709 (EP,CN,US);
G06F11/0793 (EP,US);
G06F11/0751 (EP);
G06F11/079 (EP,CN,US);
G06F11/3006 (CN);
G06F11/3438 (CN);
G06F21/6218 (EP);
G06F8/65 (EP,KR);
H04L41/064 (EP);
H04L41/0668 (EP);
H04L43/10 (KR);
H04L63/10 (KR);
H04L63/101 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REAKTION AUF CLIENT-FEHLERERKENNUNG MIT AKTUALISIERUNGSVORGANG, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/11] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS OF RESPONDING TO CLIENT FAULT DETECTION WITH UPDATE OPERATION, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RÉPONSE À UNE DÉTECTION DE DÉFAILLANCE DE CLIENT AVEC UNE OPÉRATION DE MISE À JOUR, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2023/11] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 07.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/31] | 28.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US8707082 (CHEN GRACE [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US10936224 (KONING G PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-15* the whole document * |