EP4230952 - RECOIL DAMPING DEVICE FOR PORTABLE FIREARMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BENELLI ARMI S.p.A. Via della Stazione, 50 61029 Urbino (Pesaro) / IT | [2024/37] |
Former [2023/34] | For all designated states BENELLI ARMI S.p.A. Via della Stazione, 50 61029 Urbino (Pesaro) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORETTI, Luigi 25060 COLLEBEATO (BRESCIA) / IT | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Forattini, Amelia INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI INGG. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.R.L. Piazza Castello 1 20121 MILANO / IT | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 23153394.4 | 26.01.2023 | [2023/34] | Priority number, date | IT20220003200 | 21.02.2022 Original published format: IT202200003200 | [2023/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4230952 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4230952 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F41C23/06 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
F41C23/06 (EP,US);
F41A25/06 (CN);
F41C23/18 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] |
Former [2023/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RÜCKSTOSSDÄMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR HANDFEUERWAFFEN | [2023/34] | English: | RECOIL DAMPING DEVICE FOR PORTABLE FIREARMS | [2023/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AMORTISSEMENT DE RECUL POUR ARMES À FEU PORTATIVES | [2023/34] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 23.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR1021485 ; | [XI]EP0557209 (LACROIX SOC E [FR]); | [XI]US2012125699 (GUTHRIE WALKER LEE [US]); | [XI]WO2013048959 (RA BRANDS LLC [US]); | [XDI]EP2711660 (BENELLI ARMI SPA [IT]) | by applicant | EP2711660 | EP2711660 | US10228213 | US2020340778 |