EP4223469 - APPARATUS FOR WORKING AND/OR TREATING AN EDGE REGION OF A WORKPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 20.10.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | 20.10.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOSYS S.r.l. Via Ettore Majorana 8 31040 Meduna di Livenza (TV) / IT | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTOLA, Massimo 31040 Cessalto (TV) / IT | 02 /
FESSEHAYE, Asefaw 33080 Roveredo in Piano (PN) / IT | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Giugni, Valter, et al Propria S.r.l. Via della Colonna, 35 33170 Pordenone / IT | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 23153545.1 | 26.01.2023 | [2023/32] | Priority number, date | IT20220002024 | 04.02.2022 Original published format: IT202200002024 | [2023/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4223469 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B27D5/00 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
B27D5/006 (EP);
B27D5/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] |
Former [2023/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR BEARBEITUNG UND/ODER BEHANDLUNG EINES KANTENBEREICHS EINES WERKSTÜCKS | [2023/32] | English: | APPARATUS FOR WORKING AND/OR TREATING AN EDGE REGION OF A WORKPIECE | [2023/32] | French: | APPAREIL POUR TRAVAILLER ET/OU TRAITER UNE ZONE DE BORD D'UNE PIÈCE À USINER | [2023/32] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 13.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1914358 (PAUL OTT KG MASCHINENFABRIK) [X] 1 * figure - * * claim - *; | [X]US4825917 (GOENNER SIEGMAR [DE]) [X] 1-12 * column 2, lines 1-34 * * column 3, lines 25-64 * * column 5, lines 20-22 * * figure - *; | [X]EP0997260 (FRITZ ROBERING GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * figure - ** claim - *; | [X]EP1992462 (SCM GROUP SPA [IT]) [X] 1 * figure - * * claim - *; | [X]KR101948166B (KIM SANG SOO [KR]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure - * * claim - * | by applicant | EP2251165 | EP2527108 |