Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4198733 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4198733



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 302
05.09.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.09.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
05.09.2024 Claims Search / examination 5
05.09.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.09.2024 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.05.2024 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.05.2024 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.04.2024 Examination started Search / examination 1
06.12.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.12.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
06.12.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
06.12.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.12.2023 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
06.12.2023 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
06.12.2023 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
06.12.2023 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
26.06.2023 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
24.05.2023 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
23.05.2023 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.05.2023 European search opinion Search / examination 1
23.05.2023 European search report Search / examination 2
23.05.2023 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
27.01.2023 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.01.2023 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
27.01.2023 Claims Search / examination 5
27.01.2023 Description Search / examination 62
27.01.2023 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.01.2023 Drawings Search / examination 13
27.01.2023 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
01.03.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 94
01.03.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 79