EP4227888 - IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 430-8650 / JP | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ukai, Satoshi Shizuoka-ken, 430-8650 / JP | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 23154433.9 | 01.02.2023 | [2023/33] | Priority number, date | JP20220019701 | 10.02.2022 Original published format: JP 2022019701 | [2023/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4227888 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, G06T5/50, G06T7/194, // G06T7/50, G06T7/73 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
G06T5/77 (EP);
G06T3/04 (CN);
H04N23/611 (US);
G06F3/04845 (CN);
G06F3/04847 (CN);
G06T1/20 (CN);
G06T1/60 (CN);
G06T5/50 (EP);
G06T7/0002 (CN);
G06T7/11 (CN);
G06T7/194 (EP);
G06T7/50 (EP);
G06T7/73 (EP,CN);
H04N23/632 (US);
H04N23/64 (US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP);
G06T2207/20092 (EP);
G06T2207/20221 (EP);
G06T2207/30196 (EP,CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] |
Former [2023/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/33] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS | [2023/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | [2023/33] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 30.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2009324023 (TIAN DIHONG [US], et al) [Y] 2,12 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0026] *[A] 1,3-11,13-15; | [XYI]US2010066840 (ASUKAI MASAMICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-7,11,13-15 * abstract * * figures 1-20 * * paragraph [0167] - paragraph [0272] * [Y] 2,3,7,12,13 [I] 8-10; | [XYI]US2017316575 (ADACHI KEIJI [JP]) [X] 1,4-6,8,11,14,15 * abstract * * figures 1-17 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0103] * [Y] 2,3,7,12,13 [I] 9,10 | by applicant | JP2012029209 |