EP4223198 - VACUUM CLEANER AND CLEANING ACCESSORY FOR A VACUUM CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker, Inc. 1000 Stanley Drive New Britain, CT 06053 / US | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SERGYEYENKO, Oleksiy Baldwin, 21013 / US | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 23154450.3 | 01.02.2023 | [2023/32] | Priority number, date | US202217592201 | 03.02.2022 Original published format: US202217592201 | [2023/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4223198 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/04, A47L9/06, A47L11/40 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
A47L9/0411 (EP);
A47L9/0472 (US);
A46B13/008 (US);
A46B13/02 (US);
A47L9/0405 (US);
A47L9/0455 (EP);
A47L9/0466 (EP);
A47L9/0477 (EP,US);
A47L9/0488 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] |
Former [2023/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAUBSAUGER UND REINIGUNGSZUBEHÖR FÜR EINEN STAUBSAUGER | [2023/32] | English: | VACUUM CLEANER AND CLEANING ACCESSORY FOR A VACUUM CLEANER | [2023/32] | French: | ASPIRATEUR ET ACCESSOIRE DE NETTOYAGE POUR ASPIRATEUR | [2023/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 09.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03007776 (GREY NICHOLAS GERALD [GB]); | [A]GB2486977 (BISSELL HOMECARE INC [US]); | [A]EP2561785 (BISSELL HOMECARE INC [US]) | by applicant | US8239992 |