EP4198974 - DECODING AUDIO BITSTREAMS WITH ENHANCED SPECTRAL BAND REPLICATION METADATA IN AT LEAST ONE FILL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PT | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby International AB 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILLEMOES, Lars 113 30 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
PURNHAGEN, Heiko 113 30 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
EKSTRAND, Per 113 30 Stockholm / SE | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 23154574.0 | 10.03.2016 | [2023/25] | Priority number, date | EP20150159067 | 13.03.2015 Original published format: EP 15159067 | US201562133800P | 16.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562133800 P | [2023/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4198974 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4198974 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/16, G10L19/24, G10L21/038, // G10L19/035 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
G10L19/167 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G10L19/24 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
G10L19/035 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G10L19/16 (IL,RU);
G10L21/038 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] |
Former [2023/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DECODIERUNG VON AUDIOBITSTRÖMEN MIT ERWEITERTEN SPEKTRALBANDREPLIKATIONSMETADATEN IN MINDESTENS EINEM FÜLLELEMENT | [2023/25] | English: | DECODING AUDIO BITSTREAMS WITH ENHANCED SPECTRAL BAND REPLICATION METADATA IN AT LEAST ONE FILL ELEMENT | [2023/25] | French: | DÉCODAGE DE FLUX BINAIRES AUDIO AVEC DES MÉTADONNÉES DE RÉPLICATION DE BANDE SPECTRALE AMÉLIORÉE DANS AU MOINS UN ÉLÉMENT DE REMPLISSAGE | [2023/25] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 14.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16765449.0 / EP3268956 | EP21193211.6 / EP3985667 | Divisional application(s) | EP24150177.4 / EP4328909 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | HR | 07.02.2024 | |
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 |